Financial history THE MARGARET CHATTELL TRUST

Charity number: 1106804
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 15/09/2016 15/09/2017 15/09/2018 15/09/2019 15/09/2020
Total gross income £64.60k £68.61k £64.47k £62.02k £27.00k
Total expenditure £61.61k £64.60k £64.87k £65.51k £61.45k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A