ALLERTON BYWATER COMMUNITY PARTNERSHIP

Charity number: 1107132
Charity is insolvent
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/08/2016 31/08/2017 31/08/2018 31/08/2019 31/08/2020
Total gross income £294.57k £313.21k £378.26k £391.27k £312.12k
Total expenditure £317.56k £325.69k £335.71k £370.60k £445.23k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £49.35k £0 N/A N/A £51.01k