Accounts and annual returns ALL SAINTS SPORTS EDUCATIONAL AND RECREATIONAL COMPANY LIMITED

Charity number: 1107190
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 September 2021 28 June 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2021 28 June 2022 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 September 2020 19 July 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2020 19 July 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 September 2019 22 July 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2019 22 July 2020 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 September 2018 20 December 2019 143 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2018 20 December 2019 143 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 September 2017 23 July 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2017 23 July 2018 On time Download Open in new window