NORTH CHESHIRE WIND ORCHESTRA

Charity number: 1110947
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/08/2016 31/08/2017 31/08/2018 31/08/2019 31/08/2020
Total gross income £8.85k £9.63k £8.45k £9.22k £9.25k
Total expenditure £7.41k £10.71k £6.56k £8.36k £7.46k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A