Trustees BARNET REFUGEE SERVICE

Charity number: 1107965
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

7 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
John Conor Doyle Chair 24 January 2018
None on record
Esmond Sidney Rosen Trustee 07 September 2022
THE INTER FAITH NETWORK FOR THE UNITED KINGDOM
Received: On time
BARNET MULTI FAITH FORUM
Received: On time
Geethawathy Thirusaba-Nathan Trustee 07 September 2022
None on record
Fanta Sheriff Trustee 05 April 2022
None on record
Dr Penelope Anne Trafford Trustee 08 April 2020
None on record
Dr Sanjiv Ahluwalia Trustee 13 February 2020
None on record
Golnar Bokaei Trustee 10 November 2016
THE NICHOLL AND DANIEL HOMES
Received: On time