Financial history MENTORING PLUS BATH AND NORTH EAST SOMERSET

Charity number: 1112534
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022
Total gross income £404.74k £520.69k £639.68k £649.30k £726.97k
Total expenditure £408.06k £527.27k £577.29k £592.01k £749.88k
Income from government contracts £65.00k £168.30k £240.11k £243.70k £249.67k
Income from government grants £16.74k £14.73k N/A £24.09k N/A
Income - Donations and legacies N/A £68.97k £94.68k £92.11k £95.75k
Income - Other trading activities N/A £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities N/A £451.34k £545.00k £557.20k £631.17k
Income - Endowments N/A £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment N/A £389 £402 £152 £48
Income - Other N/A £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies N/A £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities N/A £513.67k £561.64k £586.99k £740.50k
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A £13.60k £15.66k £5.02k £9.39k
Expenditure - Governance N/A £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Grants institution N/A £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management N/A £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other N/A £0 £0 £0 £0