Trustees MENTORING PLUS BATH AND NORTH EAST SOMERSET

Charity number: 1112534
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

7 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Dr Karen John Chair 15 July 2014
None on record
Mark Carter Trustee 11 November 2019
None on record
Phillippa Watson Trustee 11 November 2019
None on record
Lorna Joan McIsaac Trustee 05 November 2018
None on record
Thomas George Ralph Annear Trustee 05 November 2018
None on record
Jemma Jane Bartholomew Trustee 01 November 2016
CHILDREN OF CHOBA
Received: On time
Andrew John Banks Trustee 10 February 2014
None on record