THE STAFFORDSHIRE BULL TERRIER EXHIBITION GROUP

Charity number: 1110633
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £4.73k £3.15k £3.46k £14.72k £1.50k
Total expenditure £993 £487 £2.85k £3.23k £15.71k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A