THE STEVEN JAMES PRACTICE

Charity number: 1108220
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £119.04k £143.42k £125.43k £121.11k £140.22k
Total expenditure £105.44k £118.13k £129.66k £113.62k £140.89k
Income from government contracts £24.28k £26.31k £31.68k £110.04k N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A