Financial history CONFEDERATION OF SCHOOL TRUSTS

Charity number: 1107640
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/08/2019 31/08/2020 31/08/2021
Total gross income £365.84k £282.45k £672.53k £543.88k £1.31m
Total expenditure £373.05k £333.33k £683.99k £520.40k £1.02m
Income from government contracts £0 N/A £281.13k £156.50k £212.75k
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies N/A N/A £120.30k £83.92k £0
Income - Other trading activities N/A N/A £0 £0 £711.73k
Income - Charitable activities N/A N/A £509.17k £434.98k £600.88k
Income - Endowments N/A N/A £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment N/A N/A £9.74k £6.03k £2.30k
Income - Other N/A N/A £33.32k £18.95k £0
Income - Legacies N/A N/A £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities N/A N/A £683.99k £520.40k £577.79k
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A N/A £0 £0 £440.59k
Expenditure - Governance N/A N/A £1.65k £2.00k £6.25k
Expenditure - Grants institution N/A N/A £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management N/A N/A £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other N/A N/A £0 £0 £0