Trustees THE ST PETER'S COLLEGE FOUNDATION
Charity number: 1107938
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
CHARLES THOMAS MESSITER IND | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Professor Lavanya Rajamani | Trustee | 01 November 2022 |
|
|||||
David Collard | Trustee | 21 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Christopher Hoyer Millar | Trustee | 21 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
PROFESSOR STEPHEN BAXTER | Trustee | 26 November 2021 |
|
|||||
Professor Judith Buchanan | Trustee | 28 November 2019 |
|
|||||
Candida Lahaise | Trustee | 28 November 2019 |
|
|
||||
DALIA SALAAM RISHANI | Trustee | 06 June 2018 |
|
|||||
Jacqueline Ranawake | Trustee | 13 May 2014 |
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.