SHREE RAM KRISHNA CENTRE

Charity number: 1108689
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £45.10k £38.45k £38.20k £44.76k £46.35k
Total expenditure £44.77k £48.93k £51.48k £43.29k £51.66k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A