Financial history INTERNET WATCH FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1112398
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £2.89m £2.92m £3.14m £3.36m £4.53m
Total expenditure £2.54m £2.85m £2.95m £3.67m £3.69m
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A £292.93k
Income - Donations and legacies £1.03k £5.73k £3.37k £5.00k £117.97k
Income - Other trading activities £8.28k £29.81k £19.79k £103.04k £116.53k
Income - Charitable activities £2.88m £2.88m £3.12m £3.24m £4.28m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £2.18k £2.49k £4.18k £11.50k £7.77k
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £2.54m £2.85m £2.95m £3.67m £3.69m
Expenditure - Raising funds £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Governance £58.52k £0 £0 £0 £46.10k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0