Trustees INTERNET WATCH FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1112398
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

11 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Andrew Puddephatt Chair 01 January 2018
THE SIGRID RAUSING TRUST
Recently registered
Elizabeth Kanter Trustee 22 September 2021
None on record
Supriya Suri Malik Trustee 02 December 2020
OUTREACH 3 WAY
Received: On time
Laurelle Brown Trustee 02 December 2020
None on record
Terry Downing Trustee 01 January 2020
None on record
Giles Crown Trustee 01 September 2019
None on record
Ganapathi Subramaniam Balasubramanian Trustee 01 September 2019
None on record
Bronagh McCloskey Trustee 04 June 2019
None on record
Claire Lilley Trustee 04 June 2019
None on record
Claire Bassett Trustee 01 January 2018
None on record
JOHN PARKINSON ACC Trustee 01 January 2018
None on record