Financial history NUNEATON & BEDWORTH LEISURE TRUST

Charity number: 1109970
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022
Total gross income £2.53m £2.37m £2.29m £1.68m £2.11m
Total expenditure £2.69m £2.65m £2.47m £1.99m £2.27m
Income from government contracts £157.44k £126.34k N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A £96.79k
Income - Donations and legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Other trading activities £320.03k £290.14k £312.38k £74.51k £221.29k
Income - Charitable activities £2.20m £2.07m £1.97m £1.60m £1.88m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £9.90k £8.63k £8.58k £9.90k £6.97k
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £2.53m £2.52m £2.33m £1.93m £2.18m
Expenditure - Raising funds £162.38k £130.03k £141.03k £59.87k £85.68k
Expenditure - Governance £8.02k £8.60k £8.80k £9.15k £11.64k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0