THE FRIENDS OF ST MARY THE VIRGIN NORTHILL

Charity number: 1108282
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2019 05 March 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2018 05 March 2020 126 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2017 17 July 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2016 20 July 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2015 25 April 2016 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2015 Not Required