THE FRIENDS OF ST MARY THE VIRGIN NORTHILL

Charity number: 1108282
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £8.89k £5.96k £10.91k £3.44k £3.72k
Total expenditure £1.80k £1.53k £7.84k £292 £240
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A