DEGANWY OUT OF SCHOOL CLUB LIMITED

Charity number: 1108101
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
31/08/2016 31/08/2017 31/08/2018 31/08/2019 31/08/2020
Total gross income £88.85k £100.29k £89.10k £92.18k £74.27k
Total expenditure £86.20k £96.44k £95.89k £86.68k £83.73k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A £15.65k