MOREHALL COUNTY PRIMARY SCHOOL PARENT TEACHERS ASSOCATION

Charity number: 1108169
Charity reporting is overdue by 28 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2020 Overdue Overdue by 28 days
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 Overdue Overdue by 28 days
Annual return 31 August 2019 23 June 2021 358 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2018 08 October 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2017 11 September 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2016 13 October 2016 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2016 Not Required