MOREHALL COUNTY PRIMARY SCHOOL PARENT TEACHERS ASSOCATION

Charity number: 1108169
Charity reporting is overdue by 31 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/08/2015 31/08/2016 31/08/2017 31/08/2018 31/08/2019
Total gross income £3.66k £6.45k £5.08k £2.80k £1.92k
Total expenditure £2.76k £7.29k £3.44k £1.90k £1.95k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A