Financial history ST CHARLES HADFIELD PARENT TEACHERS ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1109416
Charity reporting is overdue by 721 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2016 31/08/2017 31/08/2018 31/08/2019 31/08/2020
Total gross income £4.95k £1.49k £2.19k £2.08k £11.07k
Total expenditure £6.86k £2.25k £2.00k £1.03k £10.81k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A £9.99k