Trustees Notting Hill Genesis Community Foundation

Charity number: 1109918
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

9 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Rajiv Peter Trustee 01 April 2022
TOUAREG TRUST
Received: On time
Abayomi Abiodun Okunola Trustee 29 September 2021
TOUAREG TRUST
Received: On time
Eleanor Hoult Trustee 30 April 2020
TOUAREG TRUST
Received: On time
Katie Yallop Trustee 22 January 2020
TOUAREG TRUST
Received: On time
Mark Vaughan Trustee 03 April 2018
TOUAREG TRUST
Received: On time
Vipul Thacker Trustee 03 April 2018
TOUAREG TRUST
Received: On time
Carl Francis Byrne Trustee 03 April 2018
TOUAREG TRUST
Received: On time
Kate Davies Trustee 03 April 2018
None on record
John Hughes Trustee 03 April 2018
None on record