Accounts and annual returns CHURCHES TOGETHER IN GREAT CROSBY CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity number: 1112576
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2022 09 May 2023 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 09 May 2023 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2021 27 September 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 27 September 2022 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2020 24 August 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 24 August 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2019 16 November 2020 16 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 16 November 2020 16 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2018 08 October 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 08 October 2019 On time Download Open in new window