Financial history CHURCHES TOGETHER IN GREAT CROSBY CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity number: 1112576
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022
Total gross income £78.79k £81.20k £60.48k £72.36k £91.09k
Total expenditure £73.01k £81.29k £64.05k £70.02k £87.58k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A £23.09k £25.94k N/A