QALANDAR CONSCIOUS ACADEMY

Charity number: 1110332
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 06/07/2016 06/07/2017 06/07/2018 06/07/2019 06/07/2020
Total gross income £1.52k £1.54k £1.37k £947 £3
Total expenditure £1.53k £1.65k £2.06k £1.91k £2.29k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A