Trustees SAINT JOHN OF GOD HOSPITALLER SERVICES

Charity number: 1108428
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

10 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Emma Gibbons Chair 30 July 2019
None on record
Abigail Ampofo Trustee 01 November 2023
None on record
Jack Taylor Trustee 25 May 2023
None on record
Claire Turner Trustee 25 May 2023
None on record
Emma Jane Peacock Trustee 30 August 2022
None on record
Adefela Ayotunde Aromolaran Trustee 19 November 2021
None on record
Duncan Reid Trustee 10 December 2020
CHUF
Received: On time
Lesley Selfe Trustee 30 July 2019
None on record
Br Malachy Brannigan Trustee 01 April 2017
HOSPITALLER ORDER OF SAINT JOHN OF GOD
Overdue by 591 days
Br Robert Moore Trustee 22 October 2013
HOSPITALLER ORDER OF SAINT JOHN OF GOD
Overdue by 591 days
HOSPITALLER ORDER OF SAINT JOHN OF GOD CHARITABLE TRUST
Overdue by 226 days