ALPINE GARDEN SOCIETY WEST YORKSHIRE GROUP

Charity number: 1108476
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

9 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
ERIC RAINFORD Chair 18 July 2012 None on record
Mattew Childs Trustee 09 May 2015 None on record
Charles Philpotts Trustee 08 December 2018 None on record
Michael Wilson Trustee 08 December 2018 None on record
Peter Williams Trustee 09 May 2016 None on record
Diana Dark Trustee 09 May 2015 None on record
Sonya Walker Trustee 10 May 2014 None on record
Bob Dark Trustee 09 May 2015 None on record
ANNE WRIGHT Trustee None on record