Financial history FRIENDS OF BRISLEY PRIMARY SCHOOL

Charity number: 1108535
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2017 31/08/2018 31/08/2019 31/08/2020 31/08/2021
Total gross income £4.74k £6.18k £7.15k £3.39k £3.52k
Total expenditure £1.18k £8.91k £4.09k £3.50k £3.94k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A