CRIMESTOPPERS TRUST

Charity number: 1108687
Charity reporting is up to date

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

15 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
LORD MICHAEL ASHCROFT Chair None on record
MR BILL GRIFFITHS CBE BEM QPM Trustee
Smart Choices
MICK LAURIE Trustee 20 November 2013 None on record
Barry Mizen MBE Trustee 23 July 2019
THE MIZEN FOUNDATION Recently registered
RICHARD ARTHUR GAMBLE FCA Trustee None on record
MR NICK ROSS Trustee
HEALTHWATCH Charity reporting is up to date
SIR PAUL STEPHENSON QPM Trustee 03 August 2012 None on record
PETER MICHAEL REEDER GAZE Trustee 14 August 2018 None on record
Lord ZAMEER MOHAMMED CHOUDREY CBE SI Pk Trustee
THE BESTWAY FOUNDATION Charity reporting is up to date
ROBERT STEPHEN RUBIN OBE Trustee
THE INTERNATIONAL CHURCHILL SOCIETY Charity reporting is up to date
THE RUBIN FOUNDATION CHARITABLE TRUST Charity reporting is up to date
ANGELA ELIZABETH ENTWISTLE Trustee None on record
PETER JOHN MICHAEL CLARKE CVO OBEQPM Trustee None on record
Stewart Anthony Harris Trustee 13 November 2019
THE CAYO FOUNDATION Charity reporting is up to date
CERIS MARY GARDNER Trustee
PHILANTHROPY IMPACT Charity reporting is up to date
NPT Transatlantic Limited Charity reporting is up to date
Sir Ronnie Flanagan Trustee None on record