ARTVENTURE TRUST LIMITED

Charity number: 1109302
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2020 08 March 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 08 March 2021 On time Download
Annual return 31 August 2019 18 September 2020 80 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 23 September 2020 85 days late Download
Annual return 31 August 2018 09 October 2019 101 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2018 09 October 2019 101 days late Download
Annual return 31 August 2017 22 June 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2017 22 June 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 August 2016 25 May 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2016 25 May 2017 On time Download