ARTVENTURE TRUST LIMITED

Charity number: 1109302
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/08/2016 31/08/2017 31/08/2018 31/08/2019 31/08/2020
Total gross income £71.79k £60.96k £62.47k £71.53k £69.16k
Total expenditure £72.97k £74.36k £67.31k £78.49k £67.83k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 £12.00k N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A £6.98k