Accounts and annual returns ACTION AFTER STROKE

Charity number: 1109862
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 01 January 2022 24 October 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 01 January 2022 Not Required
Annual return 01 January 2021 22 September 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 01 January 2021 Not Required
Annual return 01 January 2020 15 September 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 01 January 2020 Not Required
Annual return 01 January 2019 15 September 2020 319 days late
Accounts and TAR 01 January 2019 Not Required
Annual return 01 January 2018 04 October 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 01 January 2018 Not Required