Financial history ACTION AFTER STROKE

Charity number: 1109862
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 01/01/2018 01/01/2019 01/01/2020 01/01/2021 01/01/2022
Total gross income £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Total expenditure £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A