KINGDOM LOVE CHRISTIAN CENTRE

Charity number: 1111394
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/05/2016 31/05/2017 31/05/2018 31/05/2019 31/05/2020
Total gross income £12.36k £44.86k £43.41k £38.16k £39.13k
Total expenditure £11.46k £43.45k £42.55k £38.79k £39.20k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A