FRIENDS OF HORNS MILL

Charity number: 1108972
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/08/2016 31/08/2017 31/08/2018 31/08/2019 31/08/2020
Total gross income £4.79k £4.46k £5.41k £8.40k £3.03k
Total expenditure £4.60k £1.21k £1.95k £4.06k £14.57k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A