BANGLADESH WELFARE SOCIETY OF BARNET

Charity number: 1111008
Charity reporting is up to date (65 days late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2020 04 January 2022 65 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 04 October 2021 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2019 07 October 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 28 September 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2018 26 July 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2017 19 September 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2016 05 September 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016 Not Required