BANGLADESH WELFARE SOCIETY OF BARNET

Charity number: 1111008
Charity reporting is up to date (65 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £10.93k £13.21k £11.88k £16.99k £470.49k
Total expenditure £3.73k £4.69k £4.08k £4.75k £34.90k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A