CAMBRIDGESHIRE COMMUNITY SERVICES NHS TRUST CHARITABLE FUNDS

Charity number: 1108920
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £23.76k £64.00k £108.00k £458.00k £25.58k
Total expenditure £39.22k £87.00k £117.00k £114.00k £187.16k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A