CAMBRIDGESHIRE COMMUNITY SERVICES NHS TRUST CHARITABLE FUNDS

Charity number: 1108920
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2020 COVID filing extension granted
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 COVID filing extension granted Download
Annual return 31 March 2019 29 October 2020 272 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 29 October 2020 272 days late Download
Annual return 31 March 2018 02 October 2019 244 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 02 October 2019 244 days late Download
Annual return 31 March 2017 23 May 2018 112 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 23 May 2018 112 days late Download
Annual return 31 March 2016 17 March 2017 45 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2016 Not Required