Financial history GOOD OLD FURNITURE AVAILABLE (GOFA)

Charity number: 1109873
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2017 30/06/2018 30/06/2019 30/06/2020 30/06/2021
Total gross income £59.52k £66.19k £72.78k £65.63k £79.42k
Total expenditure £50.86k £64.36k £72.61k £80.89k £78.18k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A £24.00k