Trustees GOOD OLD FURNITURE AVAILABLE (GOFA)

Charity number: 1109873
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

9 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Anna Robson Trustee 13 June 2022
None on record
Norman Robson Trustee 13 June 2022
None on record
Kirsty Murray-Lambrou Trustee 02 March 2022
None on record
Janet Ballett Trustee 02 March 2022
None on record
Caroline Newborn Trustee 01 July 2019
None on record
David Felce Trustee 13 July 2018
None on record
Penelope Young Trustee 26 January 2018
None on record
DANIEL RUBENS Trustee 03 January 2017
None on record
CLIVE HARROLD Trustee 04 January 2013
West Cornwall Methodist Circuit
Received: On time
PENGARTH TALKING NEWSPAPER
Received: On time
PENZANCE AND WEST PENWITH OLD PEOPLES WELFARE TRUST
Received: On time
BOSENCE FARM COMMUNITY LIMITED
Received: On time
PENWITH GATEWAY CLUB
Received: On time
PENGARTH DAY CENTRE
Recently registered