Accounts and annual returns ALISON FRACELLA RESEARCH TRUST

Charity number: 1109426
Charity reporting is overdue by 29 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 June 2023 Overdue Overdue by 29 days
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2023 Overdue Overdue by 29 days
Annual return 30 June 2022 09 February 2023 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2022 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2021 12 April 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2021 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2020 25 March 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2020 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2019 20 April 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2019 Not Required