Financial history ALISON FRACELLA RESEARCH TRUST

Charity number: 1109426
Charity reporting is overdue by 26 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2018 30/06/2019 30/06/2020 30/06/2021 30/06/2022
Total gross income £2.10k £4.53k £3.70k £1.40k £1.88k
Total expenditure £8.87k £6.69k £575 £693 £669
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A