Financial history OAKDALE HOUSE TRUST

Charity number: 1112162
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/11/2017 30/11/2018 30/11/2019 30/11/2020 30/11/2021
Total gross income £55.02k £75.42k £93.07k £77.92k £105.61k
Total expenditure £19.30k £67.20k £102.30k £68.04k £62.87k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A £20.87k £36.48k