BELARUSIAN INTERNATIONAL PUBLIC CHARITABLE ORGANISATION HELPING HANDS BRITISH BRANCH

Charity number: 1113197
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/10/2016 31/10/2017 31/10/2018 31/10/2019 31/10/2020
Total gross income £120.21k £122.06k £106.56k £93.90k £38.38k
Total expenditure £129.94k £83.60k £90.52k £102.04k £21.52k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A