Accounts and annual returns CATERHAM SCHOOL LIMITED

Charity number: 1109508
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2022 14 March 2023 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2022 14 March 2023 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2021 24 June 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 24 June 2022 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2020 02 July 2021 2 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 02 July 2021 2 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2019 29 June 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 29 June 2020 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2018 28 June 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2018 28 June 2019 On time Download Open in new window