Trustees CATERHAM SCHOOL LIMITED

Charity number: 1109508
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

10 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Monisha Shah Chair 28 September 2018
NATIONAL ART COLLECTIONS FUND
Received: On time
WIKIMEDIA UK
Received: On time
THE ROYAL COLLECTION TRUST
Received: On time
Zehra Fatima JAFFER Trustee 24 March 2022
None on record
Rev Bridget BANKS Trustee 17 December 2020
None on record
Oliver Byrne Trustee 20 May 2020
None on record
Christopher Bouttle Trustee 20 April 2020
None on record
Deborah Grimason Trustee 20 April 2020
None on record
Mark MEAR Trustee 09 April 2019
None on record
Anne Fletcher Trustee 28 September 2018
IDE HILL CHURCH OF ENGLAND SCHOOL
Received: On time
MARY WHENMAN Trustee 28 September 2018
None on record
Dr STEPHEN RICHARD CRITCHLEY Trustee 26 May 2015
BISHOP GROSSETESTE UNIVERSITY
Received: On time