HINDU CULTURAL SOCIETY OF HAVERING

Charity number: 1110937
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/01/2017 31/01/2018 31/01/2019 31/01/2020 31/01/2021
Total gross income £16.08k £22.74k £25.12k £36.67k £3.26k
Total expenditure £13.63k £14.89k £17.96k £25.52k £5.08k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A