SHERNHALL PRE-SCHOOL

Charity number: 1109566
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2006 31/03/2007 31/03/2008 31/03/2009 31/03/2010
Total gross income £62.58k £99.05k £120.09k £112.44k £167.25k
Total expenditure £61.16k £94.66k £109.90k £111.36k £117.65k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A