NEW HACKNEY EDUCATION BUSINESS PARTNERSHIP LIMITED

Charity number: 1111037
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £1.17m £1.22m £1.14m £1.12m £1.22m
Total expenditure £1.20m £1.35m £1.29m £1.30m £1.24m
Income from government contracts £166.88k £42.37k £143.96k £40.00k N/A
Income from government grants £82.54k £28.08k £37.35k £21.18k N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £0 £55.61k £38.03k £65.47k £219.29k
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £1.81k £12.56k
Income - Charitable activities £1.17m £1.16m £1.10m £1.05m £985.33k
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £349 £283 £120 £236 £33
Income - Other £0 £0 £165 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £1.20m £1.35m £1.29m £1.30m £1.23m
Expenditure - Raising funds £0 £0 £0 £1.12k £12.03k
Expenditure - Governance £11.84k £14.14k £12.15k £0 £0
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0